+ − Transition
HSB582 is now HJR2005
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Proof of publication certified.
- Proof of publication certified.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Secretary of State.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 3.
- Substituted for SJR 15.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to companion SJR 15.
- Message from House.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8070, yeas 40, nays 57, lost.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 63, nays 34.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8070 filed.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 2005.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 8:00AM House Lounge 2.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Boden, Jacobsen and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.