+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Segebart, Edler, and Ragan.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Brink, Bacon and Sunde.
- Subcommittee: Brink, Bacon and Sunde.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor