+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Garrett, and Quirmbach.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from House.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
- Amendment H-1107 adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1107 filed.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor