+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Dawson.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from House.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 74, nays 25.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2019 3:00PM RM 315.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Kinney and Nunn.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kerr, Thorup and Breckenridge.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY
Type:
Primary Sponsor