+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 13, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Kapucian.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays none.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 10:30AM House Lounge.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Fisher, Maxwell and Jacoby.