+ − Transition
HSB557 is now SF2133
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2133.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 4:30PM RM 304.1.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Worthan, Anderson and Gobble.
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 1:00PM Room 15 (legislative dining room) starting 9:30 a.m..
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Reichman, Bisignano, and Taylor, J.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.