+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 14, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5088 withdrawn.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5088 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Chapman.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2020 11:15AM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Bossman and Steckman.