+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (71)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Dearden, Bisignano, and Shipley.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Labor and Business Relations.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104F not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104A.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Amendments H-1104B, H-1104C, and H-1104D withdrawn.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104E not germane.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104E.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104G not germane.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104F.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104G.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104G.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104H not germane.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104H.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104A.
- Amendment H-1104 to amendment H-1093 filed.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104A not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104H.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1102.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1102.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1102 not germane.
- Speaker ruled point well taken.
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1101.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1101.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1101 not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1100.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1100.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1100 not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Amendments H-1104I and H-1104J withdrawn.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104K not germane.
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 56, nays 41.
- Rule 75, duty of voting, invoked.
- Speaker ruled point well taken.
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Amendments H-1096, H-1097, H-1098, and H-1099 withdrawn.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1095.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1095.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1095 not germane.
- Amendment H-1093 adopted.
- Amendment H-1104P withdrawn.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104O.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104O.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104K.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104K.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104L not germane.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104L.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104L.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104M not germane.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1104M.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1104M.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Amendment H-1104N withdrawn.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1104O not germane.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal note. House Clip Sheet.
- Amendments H-1093, H-1095, H-1096, H-1097, H-1098, H-1099, H-1100, H-1101, and H-1102 filed.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor