+ − Transition
HSB548 is now SSB3049
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2124 substituted.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2140.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2124.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2140.
- Message from House.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2140.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2124.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 1:30PM Room G17.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Koelker, Driscoll, and Smith, J.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 11:00AM RM 304.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bradley, Cisneros and Sunde.
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.