+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 446.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 446.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Amendment H-1015 lost.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1015 filed.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2019 8:15AM House Lounge.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: McKean, Mitchell and Steckman.