+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 603.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 565.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 508.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 598.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 597.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 554.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Black, Kapucian, and Seng. S.J. 471.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 458.
- Message from House. S.J. 458.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 411.
- Explanations of votes. H.J. 416.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 409.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 366.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (5)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor