+ − Transition
HSB523 is now SSB3017
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2079 substituted.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2236.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2079.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2236.
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2236.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 1:30PM Room G15.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2079.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Bolkcom, and Schultz.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 12:30PM RM 304.1.
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Westrich, Jones and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.