+ − Transition
HF516 is now HF737
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Cournoyer.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 2.
- Withdrawn.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 737.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:30PM RM 15.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bradley, Jeneary and Sunde.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor