+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 2268.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2198 substituted.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2198.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Wills and Kressig.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Johnson, Bisignano, and Breitbach.