+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
- Sent to Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- SF 503 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1359 filed, adopted.
- Withdrawn.
- Substituted for HF 629.
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays 4.
- Immediate message.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Anderson, Breitbach, and Dotzler.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3159 filed.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1165 filed.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, McConkey and Kaufmann.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2017 8:00AM House Lounge
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Anderson, Breitbach, and Petersen.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Landon, Kressig and Lundgren.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor