+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Sent to Governor.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Greene, and Lykam.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 91, nays 2.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Huseman, Miller and Mommsen.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor