+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Smith, Bowman, and Carlin.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
- Message from House.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/16/2018 9:00AM House Lounge
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hinson, Huseman and Ourth.