+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Sinclair, Behn, and J. Smith.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3098 filed.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-3109 filed.
- Amendment S-3091 out of order.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-3091 and S-3092 filed.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-3089 filed, withdrawn.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3011 adopted.
- Amendment S-3043 filed, ruled out of order.
- Deferred.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3011 filed.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mommsen, Kurth and Shipley.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 376.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Edler, Kraayenbrink, and Ragan.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.