+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2020 2:30PM RM 315.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Johnson.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Bloomingdale and Lensing.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.