+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
- Substituted for SF 133.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 205 substituted.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 133.
- Message from House.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 9:30AM House Lounge
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Veterans Affairs: Gustafson Chair, Holt, Dunkel
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Recorded
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor