+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/15/2020 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
- Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Koelker, and T. Taylor.
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation.
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1006 filed.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Koelker, Brown, and Kinney.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 9:00AM House Lounge.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Worthan, Smith, R. and Thorup.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Sponsor added, Hinson.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor