+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 718.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 680.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 680.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 639.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 653.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 600.
- Passed House, ayes 76, nays 20. H.J. 600.
- Pursuant to Rule 31.8, timely filing of amendments, amendment H-8160 to Senate amendment H-8131 out of order. H.J. 599.
- Amendment H-8160 to Senate amendment H-8131 filed. H.J. 599.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8131. H.J. 599.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5062 adopted. S.J. 596.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 596.
- Immediate message. S.J. 598.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 507.
- Senate amendment H-8131 filed. H.J. 535.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5062 filed. S.J. 556.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 556.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Sodders, Horn, and Schneider. S.J. 83.
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Sodders, Horn, and Schneider. S.J. 547.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 504.
- Message from House. S.J. 504.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 523.
- Passed House, ayes 76, nays 23. H.J. 517.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 443.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety
Type:
Primary Sponsor