+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 922.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 802.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 808.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 798.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1262. H.J. 798.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 746.
- Amendment S-3105 adopted. S.J. 746.
- Amendment S-3114 withdrawn. S.J. 746.
- Immediate message. S.J. 747.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 782.
- Senate amendment H-1262 filed. H.J. 786.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3114 filed. S.J. 731.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3105 filed. S.J. 718.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 688.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Schoenjahn, Boettger, and Hart. S.J. 555.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 545.
- Message from House. S.J. 545.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 543.
- Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 538.
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 428.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor