+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 760.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 443.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Human Resources.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Human Resources: Lofgren Chair,Landon, and Dawson.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor