+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 423 substituted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 415.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 415.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 423.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 415.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:30PM G17.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Carlin, and Quirmbach.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Fry, Bergan and Heddens.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor