+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2022 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Goodwin, Quirmbach, and Sinclair.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/21/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Quirmbach, and R. Smith.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Guth, and T. Taylor.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Local Government.
- Fiscal note.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 89, nays 7.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Amendment H-1237 adopted.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1237 filed.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Jacoby and Nordman.
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS
Type:
Primary Sponsor