+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2018 8:00AM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Hein, Bloomingdale and Gaskill.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5220 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-5215 filed, adopted.
- Deferred.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Behn, Bolkcom, and Schultz.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kapucian, Kinney, and Shipley.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor