+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Horn, Bowman, and Feenstra. S.J. 687.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 646.
- Message from House. S.J. 646.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 669.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 661.
- Amendment H-1201 adopted. H.J. 661.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1201 filed. H.J. 657.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 388.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - State Government.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- State Government: Bacon Chair,Koester, and Winckler.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor