+ − Transition
HSB41 is now HJR5
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (59)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note, final action. H.J. 06/28.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Proof of publication certified.
- Proof of publication certified.
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred with S-3238.
- Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18.
- Immediate message.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Secretary of State
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred as House amended.
- Amendment H-1525 filed.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order.
- Amendment H-1525 to Senate amendment H-1357 adopted.
- Amendments H-1367, H-1368, H-1369 and H-1370 all to Senate amendment H-1357 out of order.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 54, nays 38.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3238.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments H-1367, H-1368, H-1369 and H-1370 filed.
- Senate amendment H-1357 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted for SJR 2.
- Amendment S-3128 filed, adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 17.
- Immediate message.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar SJR 2.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Point of order raised on H-1011, point withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1011 lost.
- Amendment H-1012 lost.
- Amendment H-1013 lost.
- Amendment H-1014 lost.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Passed House, yeas 55, nays 44.
- Immediate message.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments H-1013 and H-1014 filed.
- Amendments H-1011 and H-1012 filed.
- Fiscal note.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 5.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:00AM Law Library.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 8:00AM Law Library.
- Subcommittee: Holt, Osmundson and Wessel-Kroeschell.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.