+ − Transition
HF400 is now HF675
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room.
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Goodwin, and J. Smith.
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1108 withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-1119 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays none.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1119 filed.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1108 filed.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 675.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 12:00PM House Lounge 1.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Gobble, Cahill and Moore, T..
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor