+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 784.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 729.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 729.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 674.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 654.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 652.
- Substituted for Senate File 289. S.J. 652.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1082 to amendment H-1060 filed. H.J. 531.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1082 to amendment H-1060 not germane. H.J. 531.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1082 to amendment H-1060. H.J. 531.
- Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 531.
- Amendment H-1060 adopted. H.J. 531.
- Immediate message. H.J. 543.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 544.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 289. S.J. 544.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1060 filed. H.J. 488.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 348.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - State Government.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- State Government: Hagenow Chair,Highfill, and Taylor, T..
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor