+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Ragan, and Shipley.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2017 11:30AM House Lounge
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Chelgren, and Mathis.
- Subcommittee: Bergan, Hunter and Moore.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor