+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Danielson, Breitbach, and Quirmbach.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
- Message from House.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays 5.
- Amendment H-1121 out of order.
- Amendments H-1033 and H-1119 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1135 adopted.
- Amendments H-1128, H-1129, and H-1127 withdrawn.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amendments H-1128, H-1129, and H-1135 filed.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Amendments H-1121 and H-1127 filed.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1119 filed.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1033 filed.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor