+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 922.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 781.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 757.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 755.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 622.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Dearden, Black, and Zumbach. S.J. 484.
- Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 482.
- Message from House. S.J. 482.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 486.
- Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 482.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 400.
+ − Sponsor
Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor