+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Substituted for SF 268.
- HF 391 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 391 substituted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 391.
- Attached to companion HF 391.
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 268.
- Message from House.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, yeas 98 nays 1.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 8:00AM RM 308.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 8:00AM RM 308.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Schultz, and R. Taylor.
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Schultz, and R. Taylor.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Best and Isenhart.
- Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Best and Isenhart.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor