+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 703.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 670.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 670.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 486.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 459.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 457.
- Substituted for Senate File 153. S.J. 456.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 352.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion Senate File 153. S.J. 99.
- Message from House. S.J. 299.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 334.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 335.
- Passed House, ayes 91, nays 5. H.J. 333.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 261.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - State Government.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- State Government: Miller, L. Chair,Costello, and Kajtazovic.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor