+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-3319.
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3319.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays 0.
- Amendment H-1337 filed, adopted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
- Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Hall and Mohr.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 3.
- Amendment S-3220 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment S-3230 filed, adopted.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3220 filed.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 3:30PM RM 22
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 9:30AM Room 206 (Cancelled)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mohr, Hall and Wills.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Bertrand, and Petersen.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor