+ − Transition
HF375 is now HF644
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 90, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1494.
- Immediate message.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1494 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3199 adopted.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3199 filed.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 2:30PM 217 Conference Room.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Kraayenbrink, and Quirmbach.
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays none.
- Amendment H-1120 adopted.
- Withdrawn.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Sweeney.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1120 filed.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 644.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Bossman and Mascher.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor