+ − Transition
HF33 is now HF492
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 492.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2021 12:00PM House Lounge #2.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bossman and Sunde.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and J. Smith.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor added, Sunde.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor