+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3263 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schneider, Bisignano, and Garrett.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays 0.
- Withdrawn.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kerr, Fry and Olson.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor