+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note, final action
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, yeas 52, nays 44.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Substituted for HF 661.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed on file.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3019 to S-3015 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3015 filed.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3015 adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 35, nays 11.
- Immediate message.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Sweeney, and Quirmbach.
+ − Sponsor
SHIPLEY
Type:
Primary Sponsor