+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Greene, Costello, and Mathis.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Bacon and Brown-Powers.
- Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Bacon and Brown-Powers.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor