+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 57, nays 39.
- Substituted for HF 3.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 413 substituted.
- Committee amendment H-1102 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment H-1175 to H-1102 adopted.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1175 filed.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3104 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3105 filed, lost.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-3106 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3107 filed, withdrawn.
- Amendment S-3108 filed.
- Amendment S-3108B lost.
- Amendment S-3108A withdrawn.
- Amendment S-3110 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3103 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-3109 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3101 filed.
- Amendment S-3111 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-3101 ruled out of order.
- Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 16.
- Immediate message.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1102 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2017 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2017 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Koester, McKean and R. Smith.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Schultz, and Boulton.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor