+ − Transition
HF295 is now SF240
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Secretary's report on correction in enrollment.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 295.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 240 substituted.
- Amendment H-1038 adopted.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3017 filed, adopted.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1038 filed.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 240.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 295.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:15AM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jones, Meyer, B. and Osmundson.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Boulton, and Schultz.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor