+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Sent to Governor.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 4.
- Senate concurred with S-3229.
- Message from House, with amendment S-3229.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 92, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1382, as amended.
- Amendment H-1400 to Senate amendment H-1382 filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-1393 to Senate amendment H-1382 withdrawn.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1393 filed.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 1.
- Amendment S-3177 as amended, adopted.
- Amendment S-3203 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-1382 filed.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
- Amendment S-3177 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Jochum, and Smith.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Baltimore, Nunn, and Prichard.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 11:30AM House Lounge
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Baltimore Chair, Oldson, Kaufmann
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Recorded