+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- SF 158 substituted.
- Substituted for HF 336.
- Passed House, yeas 95 nays none.
- Amendment H-1239 adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1239 adopted.
- SF 158 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1239 filed.
- Amendment H-1239 filed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3056 filed, adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 10:00AM House Lounge.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Lohse, McKean and Oldson.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Sweeney and R. Taylor.