+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2411.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays 2.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-8172 adopted.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2411.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8172 filed.
- Fiscal note.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Hunter and Osmundson.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sexton, Bossman and Cohoon.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS
Type:
Primary Sponsor