+ − Transition
HF260 is now SF277
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 15.
- Amendment S-3103 filed, lost.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Lofgren, Johnson, and Mathis.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 2:30PM 217 Conference Room.
- Subcommittee: Lofgren, Johnson, and Mathis.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 2:30PM 217 Conference Room.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Edler, Johnson, and Mathis.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 70, nays 24.
- Amendment H-1031 lost.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1031 filed.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 260.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2021 4:15PM RM 19.
- Subcommittee: Fry, Bacon and Ehlert.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor