+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- NOBA: Final
On June 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- NOBA: Senate Floor
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5150 adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 12.
- Immediate message.
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8373.
- Passed House, yeas 52, nays 31.
- Immediate message.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8373 filed.
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Senate Full Approps
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5150 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Mathis, and Williams.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- NOBA: House Floor
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 61, nays 35.
- Amendment H-8216 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8211 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8209, yeas 38, nays 58, lost.
- Amendment H-8210, yeas 40, nays 55, lost.
- Amendment H-8220 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment H-8243 to amendment H-8220, yeas 96, nays 0, filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-8222 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8224, yeas 36, nays 60, lost.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Amendments H-8216, H-8220, H-8222 and H-8224 filed.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Amendments H-8209, H-8210 and H-8211 filed.
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- NOBA: House Full Approps
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
Type:
Primary Sponsor