+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Nunn, and R. Taylor.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays none.
- Amendment H-8090 adopted.
- Amendment H-8070 withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8090 filed.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8070 filed.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Lohse and Wilburn.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor